International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airlines Division et al v. Allegiant Air, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Airline Professionals Assoc. of the IBT, Local Union No. 1224 and International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airlines Division
Defendant: Allegiant Air, LLC
702) 471-7070 (fax: Allegiant Travel Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00043
Filed: January 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Granting 156 Amended Stipulation on Release of Injunction Bond. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants are entitled to recovery on the Injunction Bond, RLI Insurance Company bond number CMS270414, in the amount of $175,000.00, an d payment of the bond shall be directed to Allegiant Travel Company and Allegiant Air, Inc. at the following address: Laura Overton, Allegiant Travel Company and Allegiant Air, Inc., 1201 N. Town Center Drive, Las Vegas, NV 89144IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that Plaintiffs shall direct their surety to promptly make payment to Defendants.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this Amended Order supersedes Order 155 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Denying 131 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Compel, in accordance with the foregoing provisions of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airlines Division and Airline Professionals Association of the IBT, Local Union No. 1224 shall post a bond in support of the Preliminary Injunction in the amount of $175,000. The Preliminary Injunction 79 will become effective upon posting of that bond. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 81 Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction. IBT has until 8/11/14 to oppose 80 MOTION for Imposition of Injunction Bond and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that the parties' supplemental briefs re: 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by 6/13/2014. Hearing on Supplemental Briefs re 51 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 6/18/2014 09:45 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 06/09/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Non-Resident Counsel to File Verified Petition. Verified Petition due by 3/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 02/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airlines Division et al v. Allegiant Air, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airline Professionals Assoc. of the IBT, Local Union No. 1224
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Represented By: Howard S. Susskind
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airlines Division
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua D. McInerney
Represented By: James Petroff
Represented By: Howard S. Susskind
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Air, LLC
Represented By: Ross C Goodman
Represented By: Douglas W. Hall
Represented By: Andrew D. McClintock
Represented By: Elizabeth Mercedes Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 471-7070 (fax: Allegiant Travel Company
Represented By: Ross C Goodman
Represented By: Douglas W. Hall
Represented By: Andrew D. McClintock
Represented By: Elizabeth Mercedes Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?