Tkacz v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Lynn Tkacz
Defendant: Daniel G. Bogden, Leander Holston and Jeh Johnson
Case Number: 2:2014cv00092
Filed: January 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment. Attorneys Jonathan Robbins and Jeffrey Robins to practice in the District of Nevada for the duration of employment by the United States Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date re 15 and 17 Motions for Summary Judgment and 21 Motion to Amend Complaint. Motion Hearing reset for 10/1/2015 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 14 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Samuel P. Go to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tkacz v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G. Bogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leander Holston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lynn Tkacz
Represented By: Constantinos G Fountas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?