United States of America v. 1975 Grumman American G-1159 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 1969 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 50 Tail Registration No. N650KA and 1975 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 157 Tail Registration No. N468HW
Case Number: 2:2014cv00101
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DEFAULT JUDGMENT of Forfeiture is entered against (1) Bogart Hernandez Chavez; (2) Bertha Cruz; (3) Christian Eduardo Esquino-Nunez; (4) Norma Del Angel; (5) Ed Nunez; (6) Gerald Pitts; (7) Carlos Villaurrutia; and (8) and all persons or entities wh o claim an interest in the 1975 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 157 Tail Registration No. N468HW and 1969 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 50 Tail Registration No. N650KA in the above-entitled action.FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORF EITURE is entered against the 1975 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 157 Tail Registration No. N468HW and 1969 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 50 Tail Registration No. N650KA, Ford Electric Company, and Norma Gonzalez. FURT HER ORDERED that the 1975 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 157 Tail Registration No. N468HW and 1969 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 50 Tail Registration No. N650KA be, and the same is hereby forfeited to the United States of America, and no right, title, or interest in the property shall exist in any other party, other than Ford Electric Company and Norma Gonzalez, whose rights and liabilities are adjudged below.FURTHER ORDERED that the property having been forfeited , and after the receipt of a payment of $10,000.00 in United States Currency from Ford Electric and Norma Gonzalez to the United States of America, within a practicable time hereafter for the United States, the United States must release to Ford Electric Company and Norma Gonzalez, through attorney George E. Crow, the 1975 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 157 Tail Registration No. N468HW and the 1969 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 50 Tail Registration No. N650KA. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Extend CAFRA Deadline to File Complaint. Complaint due by 5/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Motion MOTION to Extend CAFRA Deadline to File Complaint. Complaint due by 4/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that 5 Motion to Extend CAFRA Deadline to File Complaint is GRANTED. Complaint due by 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 3 Unopposed Motion to Extend CAFRA Deadline to File Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting 1 Unopposed Motion to Extend CAFRA Deadline to File Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 1975 Grumman American G-1159 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1969 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 50 Tail Registration No. N650KA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1975 Grumman American G-1159 Airplane, Serial No. 157 Tail Registration No. N468HW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?