Western Heritage Insurance Company v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Defendant: Associated Indemnity Corporation and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00118
Filed: January 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Lift Stay of Case and Permit Leave to Amend. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/9/2018. The stay is lifted and the Clerk of the Court shall reopen this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties should s ubmit a stipulated pleading, discovery plan and scheduling order to the magistrate judge within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Theodore J. Kurtz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for 10:00 a.m., January 19, 2016 is advanced to 9:30 a.m., January 19, 2016, in courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Stay all Proceedings Until Final Resolution of Underlying State Court Action. Case stayed. Status Hearing set for 1/18/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that a Telephonic Hearing re 27 Stipulation to Extend Discovery is scheduled for 6/19/2015 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Heritage Insurance Company v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Indemnity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore J. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?