Sullivan et al v. Riviera Holdings Corporation
Plaintiff: |
Julia Causey and Raymond Sullivan |
Defendant: |
Riviera Holdings Corporation |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00165 |
Filed: |
January 29, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Fair Standards |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
122
ORDER Granting 121 Motion for Final Approval of Collective and Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
111
ORDER Granting 110 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
106
ORDER re 105 Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Stay all Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
104
ORDER Granting 103 Stipulation to Stay all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing
95
ORDER Granting 94 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to 90 Motion to Reconsider. Responses due by 6/29/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
91
ORDER that 44 is GRANTED to the extent described in order. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 45 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing
29
ORDER Denying as moot Defendant's 25 Motion for Stay of Discovery pending adjudication of a dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 4 Riviera's Motion to Dismiss. The Sullivans are granted leave to amend. Amended complaint is due within 30 days of the entry of this Order. If no amendment is filed within 30 days, the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice and this case will be closed without further notice. Denying as moot 11 Motion for circulation of notice of collective action. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Filing
23
ORDER that discovery is temporarily stayed until 5/27/2014. Defendant has until 5/27/14 to file Motion to Stay Discovery. Response due within 10 days of filing motion to stay. Reply due within 5 days after response is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
17
MINUTE ORDER Granting 16 Plaintiffs' Request to Appear Telephonically at Discovery Hearing. The call in conference number is 1-702-868-4911, passcode 123456. The call must be generated from a land line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?