February 28, 2019 |
Filing
600
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Safeguard Properties, LLC, Select Portfolio Servicing against Michael Harkey. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 27, 2019 |
Filing
599
ORDER granting 577 Motion for Attorney Fees; ORDER granting 578 Motion for Attorney Fees; ORDER denying 581 Motion to Set Aside; ORDER denying 591 Motion to Set Aside; ORDER granting 593 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting 594 Motion to Extend Time; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 29, 2018 |
Filing
576
ORDER granting 537 Motion for Attorney Fees as Sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that $36, 464.50 in discovery-related fees are awarded to Defendant Michelle Nguyen. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that $7,937.50 in discovery-related fees are awarded to Quality Loan Service Corp., Kevin McCarthy, and Vanessa Rodriguez ("Quality Defendants").IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that $16,875.50 in discovery-related fees are awarded to Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Black Knight Financial Services LLC, Earl Beutler, Christina (Allen) Schwarting, and Shoua Moua ("Fidelity Defendants").IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that $62,485.80 in discovery-related fees are awarded to MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. ("MERSCORP" ) and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS") (collectively, "MERS Defendants").IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SPS Defendants and Defendant Safeguard Properties, LLC file revised requests for attorney's fees w ith proposed amounts of fees incurred only in the context of discovery, within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this order.Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on April 29, 2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing
568
ORDER granting 411 Motion for Terminating Sanctions. All of Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
512
ORDER granting 414 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens (See Order for Deadlines and Details). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing
482
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Untimely October 10, 2016 Answer of the SPS Defendants (ECF No. 443 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Secur ities Corporation, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Bill Koch, U.S. Bank, N.A., and Kimberly Clarks Motion for Acceptance of Late Filed Answer (ECF No. 451 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargos Motion for Acceptance of Late Filed Answer (ECF No. 468 ) is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
January 26, 2016 |
Filing
338
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 333 Motion for 14-Day Extension to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall have until 02/10/2016 to serve 332 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 01/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
324
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 320 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve 244 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may enlist the aid of attorney Mitchell Posin to determine which Defendants remain to be served. Proof of service due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/08/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: mailed copy of order to Mitchell Posin; - NEV)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
233
ORDER Granting 202 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and to Stay Proceedings. Mitchell L Posin withdrawn from the case as to Plaintiff Michael Harkey. It Is Further Ordered That This Case is Stayed Until Further Order of This Court. It Is Further Ordered that 217 , 218 , and 219 Motions to Dismiss are Denied Without Prejudice. Status Report Deadline: 5/1/2015. Amended Complaint Deadline: 5/1/2015. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
January 21, 2015 |
Filing
196
ORDER Granting 64 , 65 , 127 , 128 , 129 , 130 , 137 , and 138 Verified Petitions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Gleason and Attorney James E. Heffner for Earl Beutler and approving Designation of Loca l Counsel for Attorney Marni Rubin Watkins. Denying 83 Motion to File Surreply and accompanying request for evidentiary hearing. Granting in part and Denying in part 117 and 123 Motions to Strike 76 Reply and 78 Declaration. Within 5 days defendants Black Knight Financial Services, LLC and Fidelity National Financial Inc. shall refile their Reply in Support of the 76 Verified Petitions to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Defendants shall also refile the Declaration of James E. Heffner in Support of Defendants Reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
167
ORDER the filing of the discovery plan and scheduling order in this action is stayed pending a decision on the pending motions. Status Report due by 1/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 5, 2014 |
Filing
143
ORDER Granting 140 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Kimberly Clark. Status Report due within 90 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 4, 2014 |
Filing
141
ORDER Granting 131 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery Plan. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/6/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|