Players Network, Inc. v. Comcast Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Players Network, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Advanced Information Systems, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation and Comcast Programming Development, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00238 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Recovery/Enforcement |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1346 Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 23, 2017 |
Filing
96
ORDER Granting 95 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
77
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order no later than thirty days after the issuance of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
68
ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation Extending the Time to File Opposition to 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (First Request). Responses due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
55
ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Modify Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 1/29/2016. Motions due by 2/29/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting 43 Defendants' Motion for Judgment. The following claims are dismissed with prejudice: (1) breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing insomuch as is premised on an implied contractual obligation that Defen dants utilize dynamic ad insertion; (2) breach of fiduciary duty; (3) tortious breach of implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing; (4) tortious interference with prospective economic advantage; and (5) fraudulent misrepresentation. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
April 15, 2015 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Timothy R. Mulliner. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER granting 37 Stipulation adjourning the first phase of discovery and interim status report deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
36
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. The following claims are DISMISSED with prejudice: (1) fraudulent inducement; and (2) declaratory relief. Additionally, the following claims are dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend: (1) breach of contract; (2) breach of fiduciary duty; (3) tortious breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing; and (4) tortious interference with prospective economic advantage. Moreover, Defendants Motion to Di smiss is DENIED with respect to the following claims: (1) breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing; and (2) breach of a consent decree. Plaintiff shall file its second amended complaint by Thursday, March 5, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
33
Order granting 32 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?