Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Three Square
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Defendant: Three Square
Case Number: 2:2014cv00344
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 80 Joint Status Report. Discovery in this matter is STAYED pending the outcome of the settlement conference currently scheduled for 3/31/2017. In the event the parties do not reach a settlement agreement, the Court will hold a scheduling conference with the parties on 3/31/2017 to set a schedule for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Third-Party Defendant Advantage Workers Compensation Insurance Company's 42 Motion to Dismiss. Third-Party Plaintiff Three Square's claims for breach of fiduciary duty and unjust enrichment are Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadline. Discovery due by 8/30/2015. Motions due by 9/29/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania v. Three Square
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: David C OMara
Represented By: Jason P Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Square
Represented By: Kym S. Cushing
Represented By: Jason R. Wigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?