Arant v. JPMortgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Frank Arant
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC, EMC Mortgage, LLC, Express Capital Lending, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., National Default Servicing Corporation and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00386
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 48 Motion to Dismiss is granted; that 67 Motion for Settlement Conference is denied as moot. The clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff and JPMorgan Chase Bank are directed to confer and file a status report with the Court as to whether Plaintiff continues to pursue claims against Chase Home Finance LLC, and, if so, whether the law firm of Smith Larsen & Wixom h as accepted service of the Amended Complaint on behalf of Chase Home Finance LLC. The joint status report is due by July 6, 2015. With respect to Defendant Express Capital Lending, Inc., the docket shows that this Defendant has not made an appearanc e. Service on counsel for the other Defendants does not render service on Express Capital Lending, LLC. The Court will extend the time for Plaintiff to file with the Clerk proof of service on Defendant Express Capital Lending, Inc. from June 19, 2019 to July 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Denying as moot 40 Motion for Hearing. Amended Complaint due within 20 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 24, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arant v. JPMortgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Arant
Represented By: William D McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Capital Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?