Bravo Company USA, Inc. v. Badger Ordnance LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Bravo Company USA, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Badger Ordnance LLC and Martin J Bordson |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00387 |
Filed: |
March 14, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 5, 2017 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting ECF No. 132 Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
November 2, 2016 |
Filing
126
ORDER granting ECF No. 107 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Defendant must serve its response to Plaintiff's Interrogatory No. 16 by 11/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/02/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing
122
ORDER granting 121 Motion to Seal 118 Reply to Response to Motion Exhibits H and I. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing
117
ORDER Granting 115 Joint Motion To Alter Hearing Date. Motion Hearing reset for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing
105
ORDER construing the disputed terms as follows: "operable to engage" - no need of further construction; "operably engaged to each other" - no need of further construction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing
96
ORDERED that the Stipulation (ECF No. 95 ) is GRANTED IN PART and the disputed terms are construed as specified herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order does not constitute a finding and is only binding as to the parties in this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
66
ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation to Amend 54 Scheduling Order (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 01/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
61
ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation re the Production of Hard-Copy and Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER Denying 37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Granting 38 Motion to Amend Complaint and 41 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
35
ORDER that 34 Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery is GRANTED. The stay of Discovery is extended through 11/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
33
ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery. Discovery due by 10/15/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
29
ORDER Denying without prejudice 28 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing
26
ORDER Denying without prejudice 12 Motion to Dismiss. Granting in part 16 Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. Denying as moot 17 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?