April 11, 2017 |
Filing
106
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 104 Motion for Copies of Documents. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - documents listed in Order mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
102
ORDER that Plaintiff's 99 Emergency Motion to Provide Documents is Denied without prejudice to re-file a motion that identifies which documents the plaintiff is requesting. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
98
ORDER re 97 USCA Referral Notice. Judge Gordon does not find this appeal frivolous or taken in bad faith and does not elect to revoke Mr. Williams' in forma pauperis status. The Clerk of Court shall serve this response upon the parties and the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USCA - SLD)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
90
ORDER that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendants Jeff Firestone and Brett LeVasseur and against plaintiff James Williams. Plaintiff's 83 Motion for Writ of Mandamus is Denied , Defendants' 85 Motion to Strike is Denied as moot, and Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Add Parties is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 27, 2016 |
Filing
80
ORDER that the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order consistent with the Local Rules by 10/21/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. The defendants' motion is granted with regard to the unlawful arrest and illegal seizure claims and denied with regard to the excessive force claim. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing
78
ORDER that Defendant f.n.u. Clark (Officer, Metropolitan Police) is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
76
ORDER that the recommendation contained in Judge Leen's 72 Report and Recommendation is Accepted. Plaintiff's 70 Motion is Denied. Defendant Officers Kompman, Le Heay, Fincher, and Johnson are Dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
71
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file and serve his Amended Complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
October 14, 2015 |
Filing
62
ORDER Accepting 57 Report and Recommendation; # 59 Objection is overruled. Plaintiff's # 51 Motion to amend complaint is granted in part and denied in part. ( See pdf order for specifics. ) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 8, 2015 |
Filing
56
ORDER that the 36 Report and Recommendation is Accepted. Plaintiff's 39 Objection is Overruled. Plaintiff's 23 Motion for TRO and 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are Denied. Defendants' 26 Motion to Dismiss is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Motion to serve additional interrogatories. Granting 43 Motion to Amend/Correct discovery deadlines. Discovery due by 7/20/2015. Motions due by 8/18/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 15 , 16 , 25 Ex Parte Motions for Service. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the Motions for Service and enter them on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
10
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint and issue Summons to Defendants listed in this Order. Plaintiff shall have 20 days in which to furnish the U.S. Marshal with the required Form USM-285. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - 285 forms mailed to Plaintiff; Order hand delivered to USM - SLD)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay the filing fee of $350.00. Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Waive Initial Filing Fee is Granted. Plaintiff shall not be requir ed to pay an initial partial filing fee as previously directed by the court. Plaintiff's 4 Motion to File Extended Amended Complaint is Denied. Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim related to his strip search in Clark County Detention Ce nter and his Fourth Amendment false arrest claim are DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff's claims against LVMPD, claims against the Defendant police officers in their official capacity, and claims against Defendant Doug Gillespie are DIS MISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND.Plaintiff's First Amendment claim is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff's state law claims are DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND . Plaintiff's claims arising under 18 U.S.C. § 1951 are DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND.Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Issue Summons is Denied at this time. Plaintiff shall have until 12/17/2014 to file his Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|