United States
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Bill Sunga Modina
Case Number: 2:2014cv00474
Filed: March 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Enforcement of Coercive Daily Fine Pursuant to the Courts 27 Order. Defendant Bill Sunga Modina is ordered to pay a coercive fine of $1,800 to the Courts registry by 8/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 17 Motion for Order to Show Cause is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to mail a copy of this order to Bill Sunga Modina at 6534 Chimes Tower Ave., Las Vegas, NV 89139, and at 7835 S. Rainbow #4-200, Las Vegas, NV 89139, and via email at billmodina@gmail.com. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Bill Modina as instructed - TR)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 21 Second Motion to Continue Hearing to Show Cause Why Contempt Should Not be Entered Against Defendant Bill Sunga Modina. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2016 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Continue Hearing to Show Cause Why Contempt Should Not be Entered Against Defendant Bill Sunga Modina. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/28/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendant Bill Sunga Modina. A permanent injunction is entered against Defendant Bill Sunga Modina and all those in active concert or participation with him per 15 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 4/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge Leen's 14 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Default Judgment is Granted. Final Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendant Bill Sunga Modina.A permanent injunction is entered against Defendant Bill Sunga Modina and all those in active concert or participation with him (see Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the 7 Motion to Permit Appearance is Granted to the extent that attorney Rika Valdman may appear in this action on behalf of the United States. It is Denied in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sunga Modina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Kari M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?