Estate of Barry Isom v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Barry Isom
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior and Vanessa Van-Zerr
Case Number: 2:2014cv00475
Filed: March 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting: 111 Motion to Seal; 130 Motion; 133 Motion to Seal; and 140 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying as moot 136 Motion in Limine. The Court finds in favor of the Plaintiffs. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Plaintiffs and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/31/2017. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 104 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Expert Designations (First Request). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation to extend deadline to file Page/Line Designation of Deposition Testimony to 7/26/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Stipulation to extend deadline to file Page/Line Designation of Deposition Testimony to July 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation for Extension of Time re: Discovery Deadlines (Fourth Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 77 Order (Second Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Continue Deadline. ( Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/26/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responses to 61 MOTION for Partial Dismissal or, in the Alternative, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and 62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Stipulation re Discovery Matters (Eighth Request). Discovery due by 7/26/2016. Motions due by 8/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 07/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation. Settlement Conference reset for 6/7/2016 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Motion for Settlement Conference. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. Status Conference set for 12/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach re Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation for Extension of Scheduling Deadlines and Joint Request for Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Travel Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Barry Isom v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Barry Isom
Represented By: Alissa C. Engler
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Represented By: Bret O Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Van-Zerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?