Ademiluyi v. Phillips
Plaintiff: April Ademiluyi
702) 385-9081 (fax: David Lee Phillips
Unknown: Ford Spencer Gordon
Case Number: 2:2014cv00507
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff has 15 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Overruling 83 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Denying 42 Motion to Dismiss and Denying As Moot 56 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Denying 120 Motion to Reconsider Order. Denying as moot 123 and 141 Emergency Motions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 121 Motion to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Affidavit due within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying 112 Emergency Motion for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 93 Motion to Strike. The Clerk shall strike 95 Memorandum. Any motion for reconsideration of 88 Order shall be filed not later than, September 24, 2014. Denying as moot 98 Motion to Instruct Counsel to File a Motion . Granting 96 Motion to Amend/Correct. Denying 94 Motion for Recusal of Magistrate Judge. T-Mobile shall produce the subpoenaed records that are the subject of the 88 Order directly to Plaintiff by Friday, September 19, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying 106 Motion for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 76 Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Issued to TMobile. Denying 84 Motion to Inquire About Status of 76 Motion. Granting 87 Motion to Amend 76 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that a Hearing on 71 Motion for Protective Order will commence 8/5/2014 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 67 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 35 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Certification due by 4/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 4/3/2014. (rss, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 4/3/2014.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ademiluyi v. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Ademiluyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 385-9081 (fax: David Lee Phillips
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Ford Spencer Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?