Patton v. Cortez Masto et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Patton
Defendant: A.W.P. C Burson, Catherine Cortez Masto, James Cox, Ira Hollingsworth, Nevada Department of Corrections and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2014cv00519
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for an Order Compeling Discovery and Denying Defendant Ira Hollingsworth's 39 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 36 Supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion to See Outside Doctor and Denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 15 and 22 Motions for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically serve a copy of this Order and a copy of Plaintiff's 8 Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this Order the At torney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff re the names of the Defendants for whom it accepts or does not accept service for. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Cortez Masto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W.P. C Burson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Cortez Masto
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Hollingsworth
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?