Gustin v. Plano Molding Company et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Gustin
Defendant: Doskocil Manufacturing Company and Plano Molding Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00700
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying ECF No. 157 Motion to Reconsider; granting ECF No. 165 Amended Motion for Court Approval of Settlement and Minor's Compromise; denying as moot ECF Nos. 161 Motion for Summary Judgment and 175 Motion to Shorten Time; and directing Clerk to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting ECF No. 159 Motion to Compel. Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting ECF No. 154 Motion to Compel Testimony of Anna Memmott Johnson; directing that Ms. Johnson must testify re her treatment of Plaintiff Cole Gustin; directing that Doskocil is entitled to explore potential pre-loss factors; directing that future proposed orders must comply with LR 7-2(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 154 Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Anna Memmott Johnson. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Doskocil Manufacturing Company must file a proposed order that conforms with the Court's local rules within 10 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 COPY of Amended JUDGMENT. Motion to dismiss granted. (member case 2:15-cv-589-RCJ-CWH only) Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 04/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 139 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re 134 Motion to set Reasonable Fees for the Deposition of James Loong, Ph.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 111 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, with leave to amend within 28 days of the entry of this Order into the electronic docket. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting 116 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond re 111 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Responses due by 10/14/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting 110 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 100 MOTION to Compel. Response due by 9/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting 107 Stipulation to Allow Additional Time for Parties to Meet and Confer Regarding Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Appointing Guardian Ad Litem. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that new Guardians Ad Litem will be substituted in the stead of CARMEN GUSTIN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dorothy Kyle, Esq. and Joseph Kyle, Esq. are hereby appointed as Guardians Ad Litem for Plaintiff COLE GUSTIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Show Cause/Motions Hearing set for 8/27/2015 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant Plano Molding Company to Reply to 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 3/25/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gustin v. Plano Molding Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doskocil Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plano Molding Company
Represented By: William H. Doyle
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Represented By: Amy L Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Gustin
Represented By: Kevin Rene Hansen
Represented By: Eva Grisel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?