Gayler v. High Desert State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Brandyn Gayler
Defendant: High Desert State Prison and Warden of High Desert State Prison
Case Number: 2:2014cv00769
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting Defendants' 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims for injunctive and declaratory relief are dismissed as moot. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants James Dzurenda, Brian E. Williams, Jerry Howell, and Jennifer Nash on the claims against them in their individual capacities and on Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages and to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Plaintiff may not seek monetary damages against the named Defendants in their individual or official capacities. The parties must file Supplemental Briefing by 3/29/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 110 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 9/22/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 112 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 110 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 9/20/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re Movant Charles Wirth's 106 Reply in support of his 103 Motion to Join. The Court finds no cause to withdraw or amend the 105 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that Plaintiff's 94 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is Granted. Within 10 days of the date of this order Plaintiff Brandyn Gayler shall file and serve the Amended Complaint that is attached to his motion. Defendants' 62 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied without prejudice and Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Strike is Denied without prejudice. The 92 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: the deadline to file motions for summary judgment is 7/31/2017. The deadline for the joint pre-trial order remains at 30 days after the court rules on any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 87 MOTION to Strike 83 Appendix. Defendants' Responses due by 1/23/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting in part 80 plaintiff's motion to reopen discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days the parties shall meet and confer and file a revised discovery plan and scheduling order for discovery limited to the issue enumerated in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Seal 78 Exhibit. The Clerk of Court shall seal 78 Exhibit for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulation re 62 RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment.( Responses due by 11/21/2016., Replies due by 12/5/2016.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 62 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 11/14/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Time re 62 RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/13/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion for a Pretrial Conference because there are pending summary judgment motions. Defendants' 51 Motion to Strike is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying as moot Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Discovery and Admissions. Defendants' 29 Unopposed Motion to Strike 26 Response is Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike 26 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying 23 and 24 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Certify a Class. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's complaint 7 on the Office of the Attorney General of the St ate of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Chief of Inmate Services; K. Howe - MMM)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the stay is extended until 10/24/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Attorney General shall file an updated status report on or before 10/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayler v. High Desert State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandyn Gayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?