Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. ANC Vista I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: ANC Vista I, LLC, American Nevada Holdings, LLC, G.C. Investments, LLC, Michael Saltman and Sonja Saltman
Counter Claimant: ANC Vista I, LLC, American Nevada Holdings, LLC, G.C. Investments, LLC, Michael Saltman and Sonja Saltman
Counter Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00840
Filed: May 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Granting 167 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear his or its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff is entitled to its reasonable attorneys' fees and costs in an amount to be determined by this court. Plaintiff shall file an Application for Attorneys' Fees and a Statement of Costs within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that plaintiff's motions in limine 127 , 128 be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 135 Motion to Seal. IT IS ORDERED that the Court hereby INSTRUCTS the Clerks Office to seal 133 , and all exhibits thereto, pending resolution of the motion to seal. Any response to the motion to seal shall be filed no later than 12/1/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying 114 Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Compel Production of Retechs Standard Appraisal Review. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that 80 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony is DENIED FURTHER ORDERED that 83 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Indebtedness and Liability is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 81 Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaim is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Denying 70 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 103 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re 103 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff shall file, no later than September 24, 2015, a supplement explaining whether redaction is feasible and, if so, a proposed redacted version of the exhibits. The Clerks Office is INSTRUCTED to keep the subject documents sealed for the time being. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to file a declaration elaborating and substantiating that position that the review at issue provided feedback on the quality of the appraisal beyond mere compliance with FIRREA. That declaration shall be filed on an ex parte basis and under seal no later than September 25, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that 78 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Nonetheless, the alternative and additional request for attorneys' fees and costs is hereby GRANTED in part. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs associated with preparing for and deposing Mr. Dietrich for the second time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 93 Motion to Seal. Defendants are further ORDERED to re-file on the public docket, no later than September 16, 2015, the documents at Docket Nos. 89 and 90 with place holders for the subject document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying as Moot 76 Notice of disassociation and request to be removed from the CM/ECF service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that 72 Motion to Seal an Exhibit is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that 69 Motion to Seal is hereby DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Re: Documents Submitted In Camera. The Court will destroy those documents submitted for in camera review unless Plaintiff retrieves them from chambers by February 19, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 16 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that Plaintiff to submit to the chambers of the undersigned for an in camera review, no later than January 12, 2015, the 2012 Garff engagement letter and the cover sheet to his 2012 appraisal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing re 16 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena to Gordon Garff. Motion Hearing reset for 1/8/2015 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 16 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena to Gordon Garff filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief with an appropriate declaration (or other evidence) by November 26, 2014. Defendant may file supplemental response by December 3, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying without prejudice 25 Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadlines. Counsel shall immediately meet-and-confer regarding the possibility of stipulating to an extension. A stipulation or renewed motion for an extension shall be filed no later than October 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 17 Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to an y documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. ANC Vista I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ANC Vista I, LLC
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: American Nevada Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: G.C. Investments, LLC
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael Saltman
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sonja Saltman
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANC Vista I, LLC
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Nevada Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.C. Investments, LLC
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Saltman
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Saltman
Represented By: Erika P Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?