Ruhlmann et al v. Rudolfsky et al
Plaintiff: Max Ruhlmann and Eric Sambold
Defendant: Glenn Rudolfsky and Kim Rudolfsky
Case Number: 2:2014cv00879
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441 Contract Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Granting 254 Stipulation to Stay all pending deadlines and filings until 3/1/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Granting 249 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 245 Motion to Lift Stay of Case and 246 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Responses due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER denying 247 Motion to Seal; Defendants shall file a sealed version of the settlement agreement and a separate motion to seal that settlement agreement by December 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER that 197 Motion to Strike and for Sanctions is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Granting 229 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 227 Second Amended Complaint. Answer due by 7/10/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 182 Motion to Compel and Denying as moot Defendants' 212 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendant Glenn Rudolfsky's 194 Counter-Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Denying 190 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 182 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. See Local Rule IA 6-1(a). Stipulations for extensions must state the reasons for the stipulation requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Granting 176 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request) re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/11/2017. Motions due by 8/11/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Disqualify. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Granting 148 Stipulation extending time to reply in support of 138 Emergency Objection. Reply is due by 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that the 132 Response and exhibits contain an account number. The Court instructs the Clerk's Office to seal 132 and the exhibits thereto. No later than11/18/2016 Plaintiffs shall file properly redacted copies of those documents on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re 127 Motion for Protective Order and 128 Motion to Quash filed by Glenn Rudolfsky. The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant to file a copy of the disputed subpoenas by 2:00 p.m. today, 11/15/16. Cf. Local Rule 26-7(b). Plaintiffs shall fi le a response to the motion by 10:00 a.m. on 11/16/16.The Court further SETS a telephonic hearing on the motion for 8:30 a.m. on 11/17/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 120 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant and Granting Plaintiff's 122 Emergency Motion for Service by Publication. The deadline to serve House of Dreams by publication is extended by 60 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Ms. Rudolfsky to file, no later than noon on 10/14/16, a declaration attesting to her the factual assertions made in the motion 111 . The Court further SETS this motion for a telephonic hearing for 2:00 p.m. on 10/14/16. Ms. Rudolfsky must appear for that hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 96 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/13/2017. Motions due by 3/13/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/12/2017. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying 94 Motion without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying the parties' 91 Amended Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order as it fails to comply with the requirements of Local Rule 26-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Denying 65 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. A Renewed Proposed Discovery Plan due by 6/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Motions to Withdraw as Attorney 54 and 55 are DENIED as moot. The hearing set for May 9, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that a hearing on Defendants' 54 Motion to Withdraw Attorney is set for 5/9/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Defendants and Defendants' current counsel shall appear at the hearing in pe rson. Any newly retained counsel shall also appear in person. Defendants' current counsel of record shall serve Defendants with this order and shall file a proof of service by 4/18/2016. Any Responses to the 54 Motion are due by 4/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens. This denial is without prejudice to Defendants' ability to renew the issue at a later stage in the proceedings. Plaintiffs 9; 31 Motion for Hearing is Denied. Plaintiffs' 36 Motion for Determination of Personal Jurisdiction and Convenient Forum Issues is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 34 Motion to Lift the Stay of Discovery and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 25 Proposed Discovery Plan. Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery due by 9/23/2014. Responses due by 9/30/2014. Replies due by 10/6/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruhlmann et al v. Rudolfsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Rudolfsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Rudolfsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Ruhlmann
Represented By: Elizabeth J Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Sambold
Represented By: Elizabeth J Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?