Bank of America, N.A. v. Bailey et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Pete G Aguilar and Samuel R Bailey
Case Number: 2:2014cv00885
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 86 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Pretrial Order (Eighth Discovery Deadline Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 18, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 81 Stipulation to Extend Time re 77 MOTION to Bifurcate Trial. (Responses due by 8/21/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 68 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Bailey's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 14, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Motions due by 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 10/14/2016 to modify text - (DL).
October 12, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation of Dismissal. NTC and Westcor are hereby dismissed from the Litigation and shall have no further involvement in this matter. See Order for futher details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
June 15, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 46 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Samuel Baileys counterclaim for negligence (count 12) 39 be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED with respect to defendant Westcor only. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 24, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/30/2015. Motions due by 10/30/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 6, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 9, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 6 Motion to Extend Time to Serve re 1 Complaint is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication 6 is granted as to Defendant Samuel R. Bailey and DENIED without prejudice as to Defendant Pete G. Aguilar. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete G Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel R Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Shlomo S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?