Zaic v. Giddens et al

Defendant: Michael Giddens and T Wall
Plaintiff: Joyce Zaic
Case Number: 2:2014cv00892
Filed: June 8, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss. Denying without prejudice 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED discovery shall reopen for 60 days until 10/24/2016. Written discovery must be propounded by 9/6/ 2016 and responded to by 9/20/ 2016. Each side will be permitted four depositions. All depositions must be noticed by 9/30/2016 and scheduled to be completed within the discovery period. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Substitution of Attorney is Approved. Lawrence J. Semenza shall be removed as counsel of record for Plaintiff Joyce Zaic. Plaintiff Joyce Zaic shall move forward in this matter appearing pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 24, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Lawrence J Semenza, II withdrawn from the case.The plaintiff shall have until July 22, 2015, in which to retain substitute counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the requiremen ts of the Local Rules of Practice, or shall file a notice with the court that she will be appearing in this matter pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF CC: Plaintiff - DC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaic v. Giddens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Zaic
Represented By: Semeza and Semenza, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?