Toliver v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: George Toliver
Defendant: Cole and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2014cv00906
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 104 Motion to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 94 Motion for Summary Judgment. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Courtroom deputy will provide details. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Extend Discovery. The following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 2/8/2019. Motions due by 3/11/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that 65 Motion for Complaint and Summons to be Granted and Served is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that 59 Motion to Have the District Court Clerk File Stamp or Signature Complaint and Summons is denied without prejudice to filing a motion to amend complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF No. 49 , 52 ). ORDERED that Plaintiff is to serve his Motion to Compel upon LVMPD by mailing a true and correct copy of his Motion to Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department at 400 S. Martin Luther King Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89106. Subsequently, Plaintiff is to file a certificate of service with the Court stating the date that a true and correct copy of the document was mailed to LVMPD or their counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that 47 Motion to Compel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that 40 Motion For Service of Subpoena by U.S. Marshal is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Motion for Service by Publication is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 36 Motion to Extend Time to Issue Subpoena is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Plaintiff has submitted a subpoena to serve upon the Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department in order to determine the first name of Defendant Officer Cole. Plaintiff was instructed by this Court that his in forma pauperis status did not ext end to the issuance of subpoenas at the Government's expense. Therefore, the Plaintiff must seek out a process server to deliver the subpoena on his behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that 31 Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER Granting 22 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that granting forma pauperis status shall not extend to the issuance of subpoenas. FURTHER ORDERED that NDOC shall pay to the Clerk of the U SDC 20% of the preceding month's deposits of Plaintiff's account (inmate #62360), until the full $350.00 filing fee has been paid. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint (22-1). FURTHER ORDERED that D efendant LVMPD is hereby Dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application 23 is denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint 25 is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to Defendants. FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendants, or their attorney, a copy of every pleading, motion or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: Finance; Chief of Inmate Services - MMM)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 22 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that granting forma pauperis status shall not extend to the issuance of subpoenas. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that NDOC shall pay to the Clerk of th e USDC 20% of the preceding month's deposits of Plaintiff's account (inmate #62360), until the full $400.00 filing fee has been paid. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint (22-1). IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that Defendant LVMPD is hereby Dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application 23 is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint 25 is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendants, or their attorney, a copy of every pleading, motion or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk shall update Plaintiff's address and mail 7 Order Regarding Report & Recommendations and 12 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis to Plaintiff at the updated address. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that 10 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is advised to file a completed copy of the in forma pauperis application that includes a copy of his Complaint by January 22, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that 4 Report and Recommendation is rejected. FURTHER ORDERED that 6 MOTION for Reconsideration is construed in the Court's discretion as an untimely objection to the Report and Recommendation coupled with a request for an extensio n of time to file that objection, and that Plaintiff's request to file the untimely objection is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date this Order is entered to either file a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis attaching thereto a copy of his complaint, or pay the filing fee of $400.00. If Plaintiff fails to do so within the time given, Plaintiff's case will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until thirty (30) days from the date this order is entered to either file a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis attach ing thereto a copy of his complaint, or pay the filing fee of $400.00. Plaintiff is advised that failing to do so will result in the dismissal of his case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toliver v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?