Abet Justice L.L.C. et al v. First America Trustee Servicing Solutions, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Abet Justice L.L.C. and Guetatchew Fikrou
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, First America Trustee Servicing Solutions, L.L.C. and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00908
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 188 plaintiff Fikrou's motion for a stay of execution and for waiver of bonds pending appeals be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 190 defendant BNYM's counter motion for bond amount be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot.Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 186 defendants' motion to expunge lis pendens be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 165 BNYM's motion for default judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 167 Fikrou's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, DENIE D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, all outstanding causes of action having been resolved, the clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 162 plaintiff's proposed pretrial order be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 plaintiff's complaint be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall enter default against plaintiff on defendants counterclaims 49 . Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before Monday, 7/17/17, the parties shall prepare and file, within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order, a proposed joint pretrial order that complies with LR 16-3 and LR 16-4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before Monday, 7/17/17, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why default should not be entered against him on defendants' counterclaims for plaintiff's failures to comply with the court's orders. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER that the parties shall file, within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order, a joint pretrial order that complies with the applicable local and federal rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the noncompliant 148 , 150 and 156 documents be, and the same hereby are, STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 5/26/17 or, in the alternative, show cause in writing why the parties were unable to reach an agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 5/5/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 106 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 107 Motion for Summary Judgment.; granting nunc pro tunc 116 Motion to Extend Time.; denying 118 Motion for Summary Judgment.; striking 129 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 135 Motion for Judgment.; denying 138 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re 121 Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Abet Justice, L.L.C.'s claims be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE consistent with the foregoing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Parties to Respond to Dispositive Motions. IT IS SO ORDERED that RCS, BONY, and HOA will have up to 8/8/16 to file their respective Oppositions to 106 and 107 . Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff's motion to extend time 112 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have up to, and including, 5/31/16, to file his motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER that 108 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have up to, and including, May 4, 2016, to file his motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants' Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens 80 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 55 Motion to Dismiss and 57 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 Motion to Dismiss, 76 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 78 Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery. Discovery due by 10/28/2015. Motions due by 11/27/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation to Dismiss Counter-Defendant, Nevada Association Services, Inc., Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Defendants' Countermotion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall provide notice to the Nevada attorney general in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1, and include proof of such notice upon filing any further motions raising constitutional challenges. FURTHER ORDERED that this court certifies to the Nevada attorn ey general that it may rule on the constitutionality of the state statute at issue in this case, NRS 116.3116. The attorney general shall have thirty (30) days within which to intervene on behalf of the state of Nevada for presentation of argument on the question of the constitutionality of the statute. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order by certified mail to the Nevada attorney general. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than April 10, 2015 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Abet Justice, LLC shall have until February 25, 2015 to advise the Court if it will retain newcounsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that Plaintiff Abet Justice L.L.C. shall have until October 27, 2014 to retain counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss and denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall have thirty (30) days from the entry of a ruling of the Nevada Supreme Court on the question identified above to renew their motions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for electronic filing. Plaintiff ABET Justice L.L.C. is not allowed to use the courts CM/ECF system. On or before September 21, 2014, Plaintiff Guetatchew Fikrou must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDERED that Plaintiff Abet Justice L.L.C. shall have until August 20, 2014 to retain counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abet Justice L.L.C. et al v. First America Trustee Servicing Solutions, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abet Justice L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guetatchew Fikrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First America Trustee Servicing Solutions, L.L.C.
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?