Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.

Counter Claimant: Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant: Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and University of Strathclyde
Plaintiff: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and University of Strathclyde
Case Number: 2:2014cv00980
Filed: June 18, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp. against Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 23, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 30, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 23, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 24, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Substitute Party and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c), West-Ward and Eurohealth are substituted as defendants in this case in place of Ben Venue. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kenyon & Kenyon LLP
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Represented By: Jacob A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kenyon & Kenyon LLP
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Represented By: Jacob A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda K Antons
Represented By: Kevin M Flowers
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Mark H Izraelewicz
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Cullen N Pendleton
Represented By: Thomas Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: University of Strathclyde
Represented By: Amanda K Antons
Represented By: Kevin M Flowers
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Mark H Izraelewicz
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Cullen N Pendleton
Represented By: Thomas Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda K Antons
Represented By: Kevin M Flowers
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Mark H Izraelewicz
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Cullen N Pendleton
Represented By: Thomas Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Strathclyde
Represented By: Amanda K Antons
Represented By: Kevin M Flowers
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Mark H Izraelewicz
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Cullen N Pendleton
Represented By: Thomas Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?