Inomedic/Innovative Health v. Noninvasive Medical Technologies, Inc.
Petitioner: Inomedic/Innovative Health
Respondent: Noninvasive Medical Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01035
Filed: June 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re Defendant's 47 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 5/31/2017. Replies due by 6/7/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2017 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The Judgment Debtor Exam scheduled for 5/25/2017 is stayed pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/26/2017 Nunc Pro Tunc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 23 Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Granting 1 Petition to confirm the Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inomedic/Innovative Health v. Noninvasive Medical Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Inomedic/Innovative Health
Represented By: Zev Kaplan
Represented By: Katherine S. Nucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Noninvasive Medical Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L McAlpine
Represented By: David Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?