United States of America v. Lazare et al

Defendant: Peter B. Lazare, Premier Trust, Inc. and Ian Williams
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2014cv01075
Filed: July 1, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 31:3731 Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendants' ECF No. 69 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 4, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED:1. That the transfer by Peter B. Lazare, the Trustee of the Edelman Trust a/k/a the Jon. J. Edelman Trust, of the Edelman Trusts beneficial interest in the Estate of Mildred Ash (i.e., the income stream from the Estate's ownership of real property in Las Vegas, Nevada) to the Aurora Borealis Trust in late October 2013 was a fraudulent transfer under Nevada law, that the transfer was and is fraudulent and of no effect as to the claims o f the United States, and that the fraudulent transfer is hereby set aside;2. That Peter B. Lazare is not personally liable under 31 U.S.C. § 3713 to the United States;3. That, subject to the automatic stay provided by Fed. R. Ci v. Pro. 62(a) and any subsequent stay imposed by order of this Court, the Clerk of this Court shall disburse $1,572,718 (plus accrued interest) deposited by Ian Williams, the Family Trustee and Independent Trustee of the Aurora Borealis Trust, in the registry of the Court (Notice of Deposit of Funds 51 and the Certificate of Cash Deposit 52 filed on July 23, 2015), to the United States of America, by making a check payable to the U.S. Department of Justice and mailing to: U.S. Depar tment of Justice Attn: Waymon G. DuBose, Jr. Curtis C. Smith Trial Attorneys, Tax Division 717 N. Harwood Street, Suite 400 Dallas, Texas 75201 4. That the parties shall bear their respective costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of litigation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 4, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 36 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count II is GRANTED; 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and 59 Motion for Leave to File is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall prepare a form of judgment and proposed injunction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 44 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment, and 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/11/2015. Replies due by 9/11/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 1, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to File Response to 44 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 7/31/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 24, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation re 33 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 29, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to File Opposition to 34 and 36 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/12/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 11, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Parties shall file a status report on or before 8/21/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/11/2014. Nunc Pro Tunc Date 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lazare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter B. Lazare
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Trust, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Williams
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Waymon Giles DuBose, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis Cutler Smith
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?