Burgon v. Nevens et al
Petitioner: Clay Burgon
Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada and D.W. Nevens
Case Number: 2:2014cv01128
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 36 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 82 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including 7/1/19, to file their response to the petitioner's reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 76 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until 4/17/19, to file his reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 36 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Replies due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 66 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until 12/3/18, to file their answer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 63 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until 11/2/18, to file their answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of the Court shall substitute Brian Williams, Sr., for D.W. Nevens, on the docket for this case, as the respondent warden. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Extend Time to Answer Remaining Claims in Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attorney General State of Nevada and D.W. Nevens answer due 7/20/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 46 respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file an answer, responding to petitioner's remaining claims, within 60 days from the dat e of this order. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings in this case, set forth in the order entered 5/15/17 (ECF No. 42 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Motion to Extend Time Re: 46 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/2/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 50 petitioner's motion for extension of timeis GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including 12/15/17, to file a response to the respondents motion to dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered 5/15/17 42 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Unopposed Motion re 46 Motion to Dismiss. (Responses due by 11/16/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 44 respondents' motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Respondents shall have until and including 9/8/17, to file a response to the petitioner's amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered 5/15/17 42 shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 38 petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal is GRANTED. Petitioner is granted leave of court to file his Exhibits Number 68, 69, 70, 73, 74 and 75 under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 petiti oner's Motion to Partially Waive Local Rule IA 10-3(e) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 respondents' motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Respondents shall have until and including 7/10/17, to file a response to the petitioners amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 34 petitioner's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have until and including 4/11/17, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. This will be the FINAL EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 32 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner shall have until and including March 28, 2017, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Second Request). Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 08/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 9/28/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Respondents' 23 Motion for Permission to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 04/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court reconsiders 5 Order denying appointment of counsel and now GRANTS petitioner's request for appointment of counsel. IT IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender's Office is appointed to represent t he petitioner in this case. The Clerk of Court shall serve this Order on the Federal Public Defender's Office. Amended petition due in 60 days.IT IS ORDERED that the Motion 8 to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Respondents shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of the Amended Petition to file a motion to dismiss or answer. IT IS ORDERED that the petitioners Motion 19 for additional relief is DENIED without prejudice and may be refiled after consultation with his appointed attorney. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 8 Motion to Dismiss.Petitioner shall have until and including September 14, 2015, to respond to the motion to dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Motion to Expedite is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner shall have 45 days from the date of the entry of this order to respond to 8 Motion to Dismiss. (Responses due by 7/17/2015.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgon v. Nevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D.W. Nevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clay Burgon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?