Eagle Rock Contracting LLC et al v. National Security Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Raymon E. Carson, Vicci Carson and Eagle Rock Contracting LLC
Defendant: National Security Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01278
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 112 Defendant's Motion for Entry of Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 110 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 101 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, the Court grants summary judgment for Defendant on Plaintiff's claims for breach of contract and bre ach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing. However, the Court denies summary judgment for Defendant's remaining equitable indemnity counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's 67 Motion to Strike is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, the Court declines to strike Plaintiff's untimely Answer 64 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motio n for Summary Judgment regarding Plaintiffs First and Second Causes of Action 65 , Motion for Summary Judgment regarding Plaintiff's First and Second Causes of Action 81 , and Motion for Summary Judgment regarding Defendant's Counterclaims 82 are DENIED without prejudice. (See Order for additional details.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Extend Time. The Court enter an Order granting an enlargement of time, up to and including 3/3/16, in which to file each of its Replies,in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on ERCs Claims 81 , and its Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on NSTecs Counterclaims 82 . Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 89 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Kenneth R Lund removed from service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 83 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file under seal, no later than 2/2/16, an unredacted version of the document at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 69 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Amended ORDER 69 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, Amended, page 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 56 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff shall have until 8/24/15, to retain counsel and have new counsel file a notice of appearance. No further extensions will be granted. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Denying without prejudice 50 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Any response shall be filed no later than noon on 6/29/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. A representative of corporate Plaintiff as well as its current counsel of record shall attend the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/27/2015. Motions due by 8/27/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs proposed Second Amended Complaint. Denying as moot 9 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss. Denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The proposed discovery plan misstates Local Rule 26-4. In an effort to ensure future compliance and complete understanding of the Local Rules, the Court hereby ORDERS attorneys Michael Ge bhart, Sandra Wick Mulvany, and Kenneth Lund to file a certification with the Court no later than November 17, 2014, indicating that they have read and comprehends Local Rules 26-4 and 26-1. Counsel are advised that similar violations in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to obtain licensed counsel and that counsel shall file a notice of appearance on Plaintiff's behalf no later than August 20, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Rock Contracting LLC et al v. National Security Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymon E. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicci Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Rock Contracting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?