Jones v. Nye County et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Jones
Defendant: Crystal Barajas, Andrew Borasky, Frank Carbone, Donna Cox, Tony DeMeo, Joni Eastly, Gary Hollis, Mark Murphy, Nye County, Dan Schinhofen and Lorinda Wichman
Case Number: 2:2014cv01354
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Nye County Deputy Sheriff Mark Murphy and Nye County Deputy Sheriff Crytstal Barajas and against Plaintiff Samuel Jones in the amount of $31,275.43 with interest to accrue from the date of this judgment forward as afforded by law. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 62 Motion for Attorney Fees. The defendants shall prepare and submit a proposed judgment consistent with the foregoing within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting Defendants' 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Defendants' 37 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Plaintiff's lone remaining claim is against deputy sheriffs Murphy and Barajas for Fourth Amendment false arrest. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re the parties' failure to file a Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2015. Motions due by 7/31/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Notice of Disassociation of Counsel and Removal from CM/ECF. Attorney Brianna Smith is removed as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties no later than 4:00 p.m., 9/23/2014. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Nye County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Borasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Carbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony DeMeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Eastly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nye County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Schinhofen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorinda Wichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Jones
Represented By: Tony L Abbatangelo
Represented By: Alan J Buttell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?