Evanston Insurance Company v. 70 Limited Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company, IL
Defendant: 70 Limited Partnership, NV, Tertia Dvorchak, John Peter Lee Ltd and John Peter Lee
Case Number: 2:2014cv01370
Filed: August 21, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 15, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Sixth Request). The parties shall provide the Court with a status report no later than 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 16, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 86 Stipulation for Extension of Time For Filing a Proposed Scheduling Order (Fifth Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 25, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing a Proposed Scheduling Order (Fourth Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing a Proposed Scheduling Order (Third Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 7, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing a Proposed Scheduling Order (Second Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing a Proposed Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 74 Status Report. The Court hereby LIFTS the stay in this case, effective 8/17/2017. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order by 8/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 68 Motion to Substitute Attorney for Third-Party Defendant, Harley E. Harmon Insurance Agency, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation of Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Todd L. Moody for John Peter Lee, Ltd. Attorney John C. Courtney terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 30, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Substitute Party. Estate of John Peter Lee substituted for John Peter Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 2, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Lift Stay. The stay in this case is lifted for the limited purpose of filing a notice of John Peter Lee's death and a motion to substitute party, both of which must be filed no later than 12/9/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 24, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 47 Motion to Lift Stay. The Court ORDERS that any Response is due by 12/1/2015, and any Reply is due by 12/3/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 5, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. 70 Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 70 Limited Partnership, NV
Represented By: Jeremy R. Alberts
Represented By: David J. Larson
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tertia Dvorchak
Represented By: Jeremy R. Alberts
Represented By: David J. Larson
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peter Lee Ltd
Represented By: George Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peter Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company, IL
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?