Green v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: Dushon Nichalos Green
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Robert LeGrand
Case Number: 2:2014cv01388
Filed: August 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 104 Motion to Extend Time re 96 Motion for Reconsideration and 100 Motion to Dismiss. Green will have up to and including March 5, 2024, to file his consolidated response to the motion to dismiss and reply to the motion for reconsideration. Replies due by 3/5/2024. Responses due by 3/5/2024. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting ECF No. 102 Motion to Consolidate Responses. Petitioner has up to and including January 5, 2024, to file his consolidated reply in support of his motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 96 ) and opposition to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 100 ). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 97 Motion to Extend Time and 98 Motion for Reconsideration. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 11/16/2023; Tim Garrett answer due 11/16/2023. Responses due by 11/16/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 93 Motion to Extend Time to File Second Amended Petition. Amended Petition due by 10/17/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 7/19/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER.IT IS ORDERED that petitioner Dushon Nichalos Green's pro se motion [ECF No. 88 ] shall be stricken as a fugitive document. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Extend Time; Amended Petition due by 4/20/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. The Federal Public Defender, through C.B. Kirschner, is appointed as counsel for the petitioner Dushon Nichalos Green under 18 U.SC. § 3006A(a)(2)(B). If necessary, Green must file a second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus within 120 days after entry of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying without prejudice 75 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 77 Motion to Proceed. The Federal Public Defender shall be provisionally appointed as counsel and shall have 30 days to either undertake representation of Green or indicate a n inability to do so. The Clerk accordingly shall SEND a copy of this order, over and above the electronic notice to the respondents, Green, the Federal Public Defender, and the CJA Coordinator for this Division. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc by mail to P and by email to FPD, CJA - HAM)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Extend Time Re: 69 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 2/4/2022; Warden Garrett answer due 2/4/2022. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. Respondents have until December 6, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 69 ). Petitioner will then have 60 days from the date of service of an answer to file a reply brief. Any procedural defenses Respondents raise in this case must be raised together in a single consolidated motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 64 petitioner's motion for a 30-day extension of time in which to file a state post-conviction petition is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 because this Court has already granted petitioner a st ay and abeyance, his motion seeking additional time to file a reply to respondents' opposition to the motion for stay is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 60 respondents' motion for an extension of time to file an opposition is GRANTED, nunc pro tunc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 57 petitioner's motion for a stay and abeyance is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner filing a state post-conviction petition or other appropriate proceeding in state court within forty-five (45) days from the entry of this order and returning to federal court with a motion to reopen within forty-five (45) days of issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada at the conclusion of the state court proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 14 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED, as follows: 1) To the extent that any part of the federal petition can be read as alleging a substantive Fourth Amendment violation, those allegations are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2) Grounds 19 & 20 of the federal petition are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failing to state a cognizable federal habeas claim. 3) Grounds 1-20 of the federal petition are unexhausted, in part or whole, as specified in t his order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (30) days to either: (1) inform this Court in a sworn declaration that he wishes to formally and forever abandon the unexhausted grounds for relief in his federal habeas petition and proceed on the exhausted grounds; OR (2) inform this Court in a sworn declaration that he wishes to dismiss this petition without prejudice in order to return to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims; OR (3) file a motion for a stay an d abeyance, asking this Court to hold his exhausted claims in abeyance while he returns to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims. If petitioner chooses to file a motion for a stay and abeyance, or seek other appropriate relief, respondents may respond to such motion as provided in Local Rule 7-2. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that 47 petitioner's motion to file a surreply is GRANTED such that petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from entry of this order within which to file a surreply on 14 respondents' motion to dism iss. Respondents shall have fourteen (14) days from service to file a surrebuttal. Neither surreply nor surrebuttal shall exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying ECF No. 36 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and granting ECF No. 40 Motion to Extend Time re 14 Motion to Dismiss. (Replies due by 8/4/2016.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Green's Renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel 28 is DENIED, and Green's Motion to Stay Proceedings 29 is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Green's Motion for Ruling 33 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. LeGrand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dushon Nichalos Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?