Cismaru v. Colvin
Plaintiff: David I. Cismaru
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2014cv01432
Filed: September 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of David I. Cismaru against Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Adopting 26 Report and Recommendation, denying 22 Motion to Affirm, granting 16 Motion to Remand to Agency. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter be remanded to the Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule to Respond to 16 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration. Response due by 4/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 16 MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration . ( Responses due by 3/18/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cismaru v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David I. Cismaru
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Theophous H. Reagans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?