Mukhtar v. Beers et al
Petitioner: Qasir Mukhtar
Respondent: Rand Beers, Steven M. Branch, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Jeanne Kent and Pamela K Lauer
Case Number: 2:2014cv01441
Filed: September 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 21 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by 45 days. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 13 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve the first amended complaint and supporting exhibits. FURTHER ORDERED that p etitioner also shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the balance of the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to comply shall be grounds for the dismissal of this action. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall change the nature of suit for this action to 465 - Other Immigration Actions. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Petition. Respondents shall have through October 31, 2014, to file and serve an answer to the petition (#1). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall serve copies of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order upon respondents as enumerated in this order. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file and serve an answer to the petition within twenty (20) days from the date that this order is entered, unless for good cause additional time is allowed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mukhtar v. Beers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rand Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven M. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pamela K Lauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Qasir Mukhtar
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?