CPALead, LLC v. Adeptive Ads LLC et al
Plaintiff: CPALead, LLC
Defendant: Adeptive Ads LLC, Michael Belmonte and Jason Butler
Case Number: 2:2014cv01449
Filed: October 20, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER to Release Bond. As this matter is now concluded, the court will refund to Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP on behalf of CPALead the 7 $1,000.00 security bond, plus interest. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting 194 Stipulation of Dismissal Against Defendants Adeptive Ads LLC and Jason Butler without prejudice and without an award of attorneys' fees or costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting 191 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Michel Belmonte a/k/a Michael Simmons with prejudice and without an award of attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 180 Motion to Strike Defendant's 175 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting Defendant's 171 Motion to Extend Time to File. Plaintiff's 174 Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 168 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants Adeptive Ads, LLC, Jason Butler, and Michael Belmonte. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying 166 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Order on attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Granting 153 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File and Serve Reply Memorandum to 144 Fourth Motion. Replies due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting Defendant's 91 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Defendant shall provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial by 4/24/2015. Defendant is not authorized to file electronically until said certification is filed with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 77 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Daniel Marks as counsel for Defendant Michael Belmonte. Withdrawing counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant and file proof of service by 3/13/2015. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/6/2015 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - address updated for Defendant Michael Belmonte and Order mailed - SLD)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 63 MOTION for Attorney Shane W. Clayton to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that defendants first motion to dismiss, 14 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants second motion to dismiss, 25 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants third motion to dismiss, 39 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for reconsideration, 30 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for sanctions, 37 , be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, pursuant to the foregoing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Defendant Michael Belmonte's 35 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies mailed to Attorneys John Fountain, Craig Newman, and Daniel Marks - SLD)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 31 Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction with respect to Defendant Michael Belmonte. Plaintiff's 31 Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Adeptive Ads LLC and Defendant Jason Butler is Denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall not be required to post any additional security. The $1,000 posted by Plaintiff in connection with the temporary restraining order shall remain in place pending trial on the merits. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies mailed to Attorneys John Fountain, Craig Newman, and Daniel Marks - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CPALead, LLC v. Adeptive Ads LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adeptive Ads LLC
Represented By: Shane W. Clayton
Represented By: Craig S. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Belmonte
Represented By: Daniel Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Butler
Represented By: Shane W. Clayton
Represented By: Craig S. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CPALead, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Malani Dale Kotchka-Alanes
Represented By: Richard B Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?