May 23, 2019 |
Filing
196
ORDER to Release Bond. As this matter is now concluded, the court will refund to Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP on behalf of CPALead the 7 $1,000.00 security bond, plus interest. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing
195
ORDER Granting 194 Stipulation of Dismissal Against Defendants Adeptive Ads LLC and Jason Butler without prejudice and without an award of attorneys' fees or costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 17, 2017 |
Filing
192
ORDER Granting 191 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Michel Belmonte a/k/a Michael Simmons with prejudice and without an award of attorneys' fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
189
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 180 Motion to Strike Defendant's 175 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
188
ORDER Granting Defendant's 171 Motion to Extend Time to File. Plaintiff's 174 Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 6, 2016 |
Filing
187
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 168 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendants Adeptive Ads, LLC, Jason Butler, and Michael Belmonte. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 2, 2016 |
Filing
183
ORDER denying 166 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Order on attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
December 28, 2015 |
Filing
154
ORDER Granting 153 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File and Serve Reply Memorandum to 144 Fourth Motion. Replies due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
April 17, 2015 |
Filing
92
ORDER Granting Defendant's 91 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Defendant shall provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial by 4/24/2015. Defendant is not authorized to file electronically until said certification is filed with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 6, 2015 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting 77 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Daniel Marks as counsel for Defendant Michael Belmonte. Withdrawing counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant and file proof of service by 3/13/2015. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/6/2015 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - address updated for Defendant Michael Belmonte and Order mailed - SLD)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER Granting 63 MOTION for Attorney Shane W. Clayton to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing
59
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that defendants first motion to dismiss, 14 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants second motion to dismiss, 25 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants third motion to dismiss, 39 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for reconsideration, 30 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for sanctions, 37 , be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, pursuant to the foregoing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting Defendant Michael Belmonte's 35 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies mailed to Attorneys John Fountain, Craig Newman, and Daniel Marks - SLD)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 31 Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction with respect to Defendant Michael Belmonte. Plaintiff's 31 Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Adeptive Ads LLC and Defendant Jason Butler is Denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall not be required to post any additional security. The $1,000 posted by Plaintiff in connection with the temporary restraining order shall remain in place pending trial on the merits. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies mailed to Attorneys John Fountain, Craig Newman, and Daniel Marks - SLD)
|