Walker et al v. North Las Vegas Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Cataldo and Thomas Walker
Defendant: Paul Maalouf, North Las Vegas Police Department and Travis Snyder
Case Number: 2:2014cv01475
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER re 222 Motion Attendance Exception re 221 Order. The Court VACATES the settlement conference set for 8/1/2019. No later than 6/27/2019, the parties shall submit a stipulation to reset the settlement conference that includes five dates on which all required attendees are available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER re 222 Motion for Exception of Attendance Requirement at Settlement Conference. Any response shall be filed no later than 6/19/2019, and any reply shall be filed no later than 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs' 184 , 202 objections to Calderon's report and interior photographs Bates stamped NLV MSJ PHO 1930, which were provided by defendants to support their summary-judgment arguments are SUSTAINE D. Plaintiffs' requests to strike those exhibits are DENIED. Plaintiffs' other evidentiary objections are OVERRULED. The competing 199 , 206 motions for Rule 11 sanctions are DENIED. Plaintiffs' 166 motion for summary judgm ent is DENIED. Defendants' 164 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to the magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Granting 211 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 202 Notice (First Request). Replies due by 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting 200 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 199 Motion for Sanctions. Defendants' Responses due by 8/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 192 , 193 the parties' first-requested stipulations to extend time are GRANTED nunc pro tunc and 196 , 197 the parties' second-requested stipulations to extend time are GRANTED. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting 178 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 164 Motion for Summary Judgment and 166 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Third Request). Responses due by 6/20/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Granting 176 Stipulation to Extend Time re 164 Motion for Summary Judgment and 166 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Second Request). Responses due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting 174 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 164 Motion for Summary Judgment and 166 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (First Request). Responses due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 132 , 133 Plaintiffs' Requests to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's Orders Quashing Subpoenas are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER that 141 Motion for Sanctions is hereby GRANTED as to the parties' agreement to conduct a second 30(b)(6) deposition, DENIED in all other respects. The Court ORDERS the parties to schedule and hold a half-day 30(b)(6) deposition no later than November 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Denying without prejudice 150 Amended Motion for Order Fixing Expert Witness Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 148 Stipulation to extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. ( Motions due by 8/16/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Denying 145 Motion or an order fixing expert witness fees related to a deposition taken on 6/8/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting 137 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 133 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order (First Request). Responses due by 6/8/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting 135 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 132 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order (First Request). Replies due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting 118 Amended Motion to Quash Supboena. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 128 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 118 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying without prejudice 126 Stipulation for Extension of Time. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER. The Court hereby GRANTS 116 Henderson's motion to quash subpoena. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Eleventh Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery as amended on p. 12. Discovery due by 6/15/2017. Motions due by 7/17/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 109 Stipulation To Discovery Disclosure Deadlines Set Forth in Scheduling Order ( Discovery due by 2/3/2017, Motions due by 3/6/2017, Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OVERRULING 92 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. the Court hereby awards Plaintiffs $1,550.00 in reasonable attorneys' fees. Plaintiffs did not submit a request for reasonable costs. Payment shall be made to Plaintiffs' counsel in this amount no later than July 8, 2016. Defendant's counsel is ordered to file a proof of payment on the docket by that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 65 Motion for Leave to File a Second-Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Amended Complaint due 5/12/16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 Motion to Bifurcate Trial and 72 Motion to Stay Discovery are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for May 2, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulation re 60 MOTION to Compel. Replies due by 3/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation re 60 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 48 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 48 MOTION to Compel. Replies due by 1/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response re 42 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/18/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant must submit to chambers of the undersigned, in camera, all internal affairs documents regarding prior incidents involving the use of force against dogs by NLVPD officers, no later than November 19, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Defendant NLVPD to submit the referenced documents to the chambers of the undersigned for an in camera review, no later than October 29, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. North Las Vegas Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Cataldo
Represented By: Robert Langford
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Walker
Represented By: Robert Langford
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Maalouf
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Las Vegas Police Department
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Snyder
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?