Maldonado-Mejia v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Maldonado-Mejia
Respondent: Catherine Cortez-Masto and Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01484
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. A certificate of appealability shall not issue and the Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Respondents' 30 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Respondents' 17 Motion to Dismiss 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents shall file an answer to the remaining claims of the Amended Petition within 45 days of the date of entry of this Order. Maldonado-Mejia shall file a Reply within 30 days of the date of service of the Answer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that petitioner shall file any response to the motion to dismiss by October 19, 2018. Given the lengthy period of time the motion to dismiss has been pending, I will not grant any extensions of time to oppose absent an extraordinary showing of good cause. Should petitioner choose not to file a timely opposition to the motion to dismiss, the matter will stand submitted. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Extend Time Re: 17 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents' Replies due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Respondents' 12 Motion for Amended Briefing Schedule. Petitioner shall file all exhibits to the 9 Amended Petition within 30 days of the entry of this Order (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that 2 Motion for a Stay is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending resolution of petitioner's post-conviction habeas petition (Eighth District Case No. 09C259004) and any appeal therefrom. FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is co nditioned upon petitioner returning to federal court with a motion to reopen the case within 45 days of the issuance of the entry and notice of the state district court's order, or if an appeal is taken, the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Ne vada, at the conclusion of the state court proceedings on the post-conviction habeas petition, whichever is later. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk SHALL ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the Court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado-Mejia v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Maldonado-Mejia
Represented By: Lisa A Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?