Garcia Hernandez v. VanVeen

Plaintiff: Maria Garcia Hernandez
Defendant: Case Peter VanVeen
Case Number: 2:2014cv01493
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 180 ORDER Granting Extension of Time Re: 178 Order. Settlement documents are due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 170 ORDER Granting 167 , 168 Stipulations to Extend Deadline and Stay Case. Case Stayed until 4/9/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 164 ORDER Granting 163 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 160 ORDER Granting 159 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 158 ORDER Granting 157 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 154 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 139 defendants' first motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 140 that defendants' second motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 141 plaintiff's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order 127 ORDER Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due 21 days from date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order 124 ORDER re 110 Motion to Preclude or Limit Testimony of Paul Paxton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order 122 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 121 Stipulation Requesting A Settlement Conference is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 119 Stipulation to Extend Discovery is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 9/20/16, attorney Steven T. Jaffe must draft, circulate, and file a proposed order reflecting the court's rulings at the hearing held on 8/22/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 102 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Spoliation of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order 99 ORDER Granting 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Maria Garcia Hernandez shall pay Defendants the total sum of $2,226.00 at the conclusion of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Seal Exhibit Filed in 76 Motion to Extend Time regarding Discovery matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall seal Defendants' Emergency Motion to Extend Discovery 76 in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' counsel shall re-file the entire 76 Emergency Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, including all exhibits, with appropriate redactions to all exhibits within 7 days from the date of the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order 62 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order 61 ORDER Denying 20 Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until May 21, 2015, to file a motion for fees incurred for having to oppose this motion. Plaintiff's response is due on or before June 1, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order 59 ORDER granting 31 Emergency Motion to Quash Unilaterally serviced subpoena. Plaintiff shall return all originals of any and all information received in response to the subpoena back to Dr. Duke. Plaintiff is further directed to destroy any and a ll copies of information received in response to the subpoena. Plaintiff is directed to submit a notice by May 12, 2015 indicating compliance with this order. Failure to comply with this order will result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER that 37 Motion to Seal is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a properly redacted exhibit by Friday, March 20, 2015. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall strike docket entry 38 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia Hernandez v. VanVeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Garcia Hernandez
Represented By: Troy L Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Peter VanVeen
Represented By: Karen L Bashor
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?