Landeros et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Angel Landeros and Amelia Villalba
Defendant: Sheriff Douglas Gillespie, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Officer Joseph Parra, Officer Scott Thomas and Clyde Villanueva
Case Number: 2:2014cv01525
Filed: September 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT the transcript of the testimony given by defendants Scott Thomas and Clyde Villanueva on 1/29/2019, be prepared for the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Court Reporter - MR)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re: Jury Meals. This Court having ordered the jury impaneled in this action to be kept together during period(s) of deliberation, IT IS ORDERED that all meals for said jury shall be paid by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation to Continue Trial. Calendar Call continued to 1/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Jury Trial continued to 1/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the clerk shall lift the stay in the instant case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 47 Plaintiffs' counsel's motion to withdraw as attorney is GRANTED. The clerk shall remove Cal J. Potter III and Cal J. Potter IV as attorneys of record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a c opy of this order to Plaintiffs at the address provided in the motion to withdraw. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 49 Plaintiffs' motion to stay is GRANTED. This case is STAYED. The parties must meet and confer and file a joint status report no later than 2/13/2018. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Motion for Defendant Ofc. Clyde Villanueva's Request for Exception of Attendance Requirement at the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Defendant Ofc. Joseph Parra's 42 Motion for Exception of Attendance Requirement at the Settlement Conference Scheduled for 7/13/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/16/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landeros et al v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Douglas Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joseph Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Landeros
Represented By: Richard A. Patterson
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Villalba
Represented By: Richard A. Patterson
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?