Hunter v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Hunter
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center, Gillispie, Tierra Jones, Lepora, McArthur, Napha Healthcare, Rochelle Nguyen and Megan Thomson
Case Number: 2:2014cv01560
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED 69 defendant Naphcare, Inc.'s motion to dismiss and 71 defendant Darren McArthur's joinder are GRANTED. The clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of defendants Naphcare, Inc. and Darren McArthur and against plaintiff Christopher Hunter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 62 the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Christopher Hunter is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Yampolsky must mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Hunter and lodge Plaintiff's last know n contact information with the court by 4/3/2018.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Hunter must either retain counsel or file a notice of appearing pro se on or before 5/4/2018.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Hunter must file with the Court written notification of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. Discovery Hearing set for 11/30/2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 26 defendant Naphcare, Inc.'s motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall correct the caption to reflect that defendant Napha Healthcare is corre ctly identified as Naphcare, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall also forward this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Strike Opposition and Denying 43 Motion to Strike Letter. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that 26 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff Christopher Hunter's claims against Naphcare are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Reattempt Service on Unserved Defendant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a subpoena duces tecum be issued to the custodian of records at the Clark County Detention Center directing the custodian to determine the first and last name and last-known address of an officer McArthur who worked at the Clark County Detention Center in August, 2014. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve this subpoena, together with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lepora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napha Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?