July 16, 2018 |
Filing 41
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/16/2018. This case was previously ordered consolidated under case 2:14-cv-00492 [ECF No. 37]. This lead case was closed on July 11, 2018. The order closing that case applies to this case as well. The Clerk of Court is therefore instructed to close this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing 40
RESPONSE to by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Ellis, Emily)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing 39
ORDER Denying #1 Motion to Quash and Granting #10 Motion to Compel. It is Further Ordered that in Member Case 2:14-cv-00492 that (#14) and (#60) are Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing 38
ORDER Denying #21 , #22 , 28 , and #30 Motions to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing 37
ORDER to Consolidate Granting #35 Stipulation to Consolidate Related Matters. It is ORDERED that 2:14-cv-01573-RFB-VCF is/are consolidated under 2:14-cv-00492-RFB-VCF. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing 36
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 33 Motion Hearing, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci (702)385-0670. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER Redaction Request due 1/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2015. (PG)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing 35
STIPULATION and ORDER to Consolidate Related Matters by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. (Baker, Nikki)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 34
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Motion to Intervene. Sealed Motion to Unseal or Stipulation due by 1/16/2015.Stipulation regarding consolidation due by 12/19/2014.Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2015 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 33
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2014 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: Eileen Wood; Pla Counsel: Dennis Hranitzky, Kirk Lenhard; Def Counsel: Kent Woods, Andrew Platt, John Bulloch, Jason Wiley, Daniel Cereghino, Teresa Haar; FTR #: 1:03-1:29; Time of Hearing: 1:03-1:29 PM; Courtroom: 3D; RE: #10 Cross MOTION to Compel, #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order, #22 MOTION for Leave to File (REVISED) under Seal the Memorandum in Response to Nonparty Val De Loire LLC's Motion to Quash Subpoena or, In the Alternative, for Protective Order; and in Support of NML's Cross Motion, 28 SEALED MOTION to Seal #27 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibits A, B, C, and G, #21 MOTION to Seal Motion By Non-Party Witness Patricia Amunetgui to Maintain Seal and To Enforce Protective Order, and #30 Emergency MOTION to Exclude NML Capital Ltd.'s Proposed Demonstrative Exhibits. The Court hears representations of counsel. The Court instructs counsel to draft and circulate a stipulation to consolidate this matter with 2:14-CV-492 RFB-VCF. The Court will further order a briefing schedule on the remaining pending motions. Written Order to follow. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing 32
ORDER Regarding Hearing Set for December 12, 2014 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3D re: #30 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing 31
JOINDER to #30 Emergency MOTION to Exclude NML Capital Ltd.'s Proposed Demonstrative Exhibits ; filed by Movant Patricia Amunategui, Interested Party MF Corporate Services (Nevada) Limited. (Woods, Kent)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing 30
Emergency MOTION to Exclude NML Capital Ltd.'s Proposed Demonstrative Exhibits by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2014. (Wiley, Jason)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 29
ORDER Regarding Hearing Set for December 12, 2014 at 1:00 pm in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing 27
REPLY to Response to #10 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Expert Pablo Maggio, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H (1 of 2), #10 Exhibit H (2 of 2))(Ellis, Emily)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing 26
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 11/7/2014. ORDERED that a Hearing set for 12/12/2014 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on the following motions: #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order; #10 NML Capital, Ltd.'s Memorandum In Response To Nonparty Val De Loire LLC's Motion To Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order; And In Support Of NML's Cross Motion To Compel; #21 Motion By Non-Party Witness Patricia Amunetgui to Maintain Seal and To Enforce Protective Order; and #22 MOTION for Leave to File (REVISED) under Seal the Memorandum in Response to Nonparty Val De Loire LLC's Motion to Quash Subpoena or, In the Alternative, for Protective Order; and in Support of NML's Cross Motion to Compel and Exhibit "S" Thereto. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing 25
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 11/5/2014. This case having been reassigned to District Judge Boulware and Magistrate Judge Ferenbach,IT IS ORDERED that the hearing on the Motion to Quash #1 and Cross Motion to Compel #10 currently scheduled to be heard November 18, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Leen, is VACATED and shall be handled before the appropriate judge assigned to this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing 24
ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for all further proceedings. Judge Lloyd D. George and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:14-cv-01573-RFB-VCF. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/04/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing 23
DECLARATION of Edmund Ward re #13 Reply to Response to Motion ; by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing 22
MOTION for Leave to File (REVISED) under Seal the Memorandum in Response to Nonparty Val De Loire LLC's Motion to Quash Subpoena or, In the Alternative, for Protective Order; and in Support of NML's Cross Motion by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. Motion ripe 10/30/2014. (Baker, Nikki)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing 21
MOTION to Seal Motion By Non-Party Witness Patricia Amunetgui to Maintain Seal and To Enforce Protective Order by Movant Patricia Amunategui. Motion ripe 10/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia Amunategui In Support of NML Capital LTD.'s Motion to File Under Seal)(Woods, Kent)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Hearing on #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order, and #10 Cross MOTION to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2014, at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
|
October 24, 2014 |
Filing 19
ORDER granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dennis Harry Hranitzky as to NML Capital, Ltd. and approving Nikki L. Baker as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/23/2014. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 23, 2014 |
Filing 18
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Reply to #10 Cross MOTION to Compel. Replies due by 11/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 23, 2014 |
Filing 17
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #10 Cross MOTION to Compel ; by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. (Lenhard, Kirk)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 16
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dennis H. Hranitzky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nikki L. Baker (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-3430033) filed by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd. . Motion ripe 10/21/2014. (Baker, Nikki)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 15
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #13 REPLY. ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney, Jason Wiley. In accordance with Special Order 109, a separate document must be filed for each type of document or purpose. CORRECTION: Court docketed the RESPONSE contained within document #13 as #14 RESPONSE to Cross MOTION to Compel.(MAJ)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing 14
RESPONSE to #10 Cross MOTION to Compel, filed by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. Replies due by 10/30/2014. (MAJ)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing 13
REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order filed by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing 12
ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff shall have until October 30, 2014, to file a memorandum of points and authorities and any supporting declaration or affidavit to make a particularized showing of good cause why the Response and Cross-Motion filed with the Motion to Seal should remain under seal. The Response and Cross Motion filed with the Motion to Seal shall remain under seal until October 30, 2014. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the documents to make them available on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing 11
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #8 RESPONSE. ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney. In accordance with Special Order 109, a separate document must be filed for each type of document or purpose.CORRECTION: Court docketed the MOTION contained within document #8 as #10 Cross MOTION to Compel. (MAJ)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing 10
Cross MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. Responses due by 10/26/2014. (MAJ)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing 8
RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. Replies due by 10/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X)(Baker, Nikki)
|
October 3, 2014 |
Filing 7
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION by Val de Loire, LLC re #6 Notice of Related Cases. (Wiley, Jason)
|
October 2, 2014 |
Filing 6
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:14-cv-00492-RFB-VCF by Plaintiff NML Capital, Ltd.. (Baker, Nikki)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing 5
ERRATA to #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order ; filed by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Jason)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 4
DECLARATION of Edmund Ward re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order ; by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 3
DECLARATION re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order ; Declaration of Patricia Amunategui by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. (Wiley, Jason)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 2
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 029304 (SLR)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Case assigned to Judge Lloyd D. George and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (SLR)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing 1
MOTION to Quash Subpoena Or, In The Alternative, For Protective Order; filed by Movant Val de Loire, LLC. Motion ripe 9/24/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wiley, Jason)
|