Grant v. Nevada Disability Advocacy And Law Center
Plaintiff: Gregory G. Grant
Defendant: Nevada Disability Advocacy And Law Center
Case Number: 2:2014cv01640
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REFERRAL TO PRO BONO PROGRAM : This case is referred to the Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel for the purposes identified herein. Clerk shall forward this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. (Ad hoc email to Liaison on 2/14/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. The court orders the random assignment of this case to a northern district judge and a northern magistrate judge so that plaintiff will have greater odds of having the merits of his case adjudicated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re Status to identify a guardian ad litem as well as a pro bono attorney to represent Mr. Grant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re pro se plaintiff's referral to UNLV pro bono program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re referral of pro se plaintiff Gregory G. Grant's case to the State Bar of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. The court has been unable to place the case with Nevada Legal Services, the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, or Washoe Legal Services. In its continuing effort to assist Mr. Grant, the court sent a written notice to the State Bar of Nevad a on 3/30/2018, to attempt to secure representation for Mr. Grant. The court will continue to notify Mr. Grant of the case status when updates are available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 57 Response to Court Order. The court will continue its efforts to secure representation for Mr. Grant through Washoe Legal Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. The court is continuing its efforts to attempt to secure representation for Plaintiff through Washoe Legal Services. The court requests that the Pro Bono Liaison continue to attempt to secure representation for Plaintiff through the Pro Bon o Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff Gregory G. Grant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - MR)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. The court requests that the Pro Bono Liaison continue to attempt to secure representation for Plaintiff through the Pro Bono Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff Gregory G. Grant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - MR)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that a video conference hearing regarding Plaintiff Gregory G. Grant's claim of incompetency is set for Friday, February 12, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. in Room #3054. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections must make Plaintiff Gregory G. Grant available at the Northern Nevada Correctional Center for the video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion to Continue Hearing. The court will enter a separate order when the date and time are confirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to Plaintiff paper copies of the docket sheet and all filed documents in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that a video conference hearing regarding claim of incompetency is set for 10/20/2015 09:00 AM in Room #3054, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada. Plaintiff Grant must participate in the hearing through video conferencing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections must make Plaintiff Gregory G. Grant available at the Northern Nevada Correctional Center for the video conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any documentary evidence is due 10/13/15. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Grant's attorney must file a notice with the court containing updated contact information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 22 Motion to Feed is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Motion to Protect Plaintiff is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank forms w/instructions to plaintiff - MMM)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that 15 Motion for Change of Judge is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Motion to Have Lights Turned on is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days, Plaintiff shall identify with specificity and/or provide a copy of the order declaring him incompetent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on plaintiff's failure to file a complaint and an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee in compliance with this courts October 16, 2014, order. It is further ordered that the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff shall submit a complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 USC 1983 complaint and instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that the Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis and instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of this order Plaintiff shall either submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $400 filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a decision on the motion for appointment for a guardian ad litem is deferred until the matters of the payment and the filing fee are resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Plaintiff - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Nevada Disability Advocacy And Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory G. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Disability Advocacy And Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?