Schuett v. Collins et al
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Schuett
Defendant: Steven Carpenter, f.n.u, Collins and f.n.u. Delaney
Case Number: 2:2014cv01645
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Court's 3/27/15 order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that 28 Motion for Writ and 26 Motion for Writ are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff two copies of an in forma pauperis application form for a prisoner, one copy of the ins tructions for same, two copies of a blank 28 U.S.C. Section 2254 habeas corpus form, and one copy of instructions for the same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, plaintiff has until April 27, 2015, to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t the Clerk of Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, a copy of his original complaint 25 , and a copy of this Courts December 17, 2014 screening order 24 . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court SHALL FILE the complaint. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the attention of Chief of Inmate Services. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the c omplaint is dismissed in its entirety for failure to state a claim. Amended Complaint deadline: 1/16/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for t he same, and a copy of his original complaint (Doc. 1-1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 Motion for Hearing, 6 Motion to Compel, 7 Motion to Compel, 9 Motion for Protective Order, 11 Motion for Protective Order, 14 Motion, 17 Mo tion, 18 Motion for Hearing, 20 Motion, 21 Motion, and 22 Motion are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff a copy of his motions for protective orders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Motion for Writ and 8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff two copies of an in forma pauperis application form for a prisoner, one copy of the instructions for same, two copies of a blank 28 U.S.C. § 2254 habeas corpus form, and one copy of instructions for the same. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies served as ordered TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuett v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f.n.u, Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f.n.u. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Schuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?