Dowers et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dale Dowers and Debra Dowers
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, NA and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01679
Filed: October 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Defendants' 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall prepare and submit to the court a proposed judgment within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the parties shall file within 21 days of the entry of this order, a joint status report briefing the current status of the case, what actions have been completed, and what actions need to be completed in light of the Ninth Circuit's remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowers et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Dowers
Represented By: Mark C Fields
Represented By: Robert C Reade
Represented By: Jay A Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Dowers
Represented By: Mark C Fields
Represented By: Robert C Reade
Represented By: Jay A Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, NA
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?