Lewis v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01683
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 184 Plaintiff's Motion for Motion for Damages and Recovery is GRANTED in part and DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 174 Defendant's Motion to Allow Consideration of Aviation Institute Maintenance Records in Post-Trial Briefing is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Plaintiff and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 112 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion Requesting Leave to Pay is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is to make his first $200 monthly installment no later than 3/1/17 and continuing each month thereafter until the sanction is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance ADR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 118 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Reply to Defendant's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause 103 from the record in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re 96 Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay Defendant the total sum of $4,656.58. Plaintiff is ordered to make the payment to Defendant by 1/31/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation Extending the Time to File a Joint Pretrial Order. ( Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/10/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation Extending Time to File a Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 10/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties' counsel of record that Defendant will have an extension of time up to and including 3/18/16 to oppose Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 67 .IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiff will have an extension of time up to and including 3/18/16 to oppose Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 68 . Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Summary Judgment Opposition (First Request). Defendant will have an extension of time up to and including 3/10/16, to oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 67 and Plaintiff will have an extension of time up to and including 3/10/16 to oppose Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 68 . Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation to Postpone Summary Judgment Filing deadline (Fourth Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Pursuant to Order 57 the Defendant submitted attorney-client communications for in camera review. The Court has reviewed those documents and finds that they do not support a finding that the crime-fraud exception to the attorney-client pr ivilege applies. As set for in Order 57 the information otherwise presented to the Court does not support application of the crime-fraud exception by a preponderance of the evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 41 Motion Requesting an In Camera Review of Select Items. On or before 1/4/16, Defendant shall deliver to the Court's chambers for in camera review, the email communications between Defendant's employees and its in-house counsel, Kelly Giustina, relating to the Defendant's termination that occurred from 8/28/12 and 9/11/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation and Order to Postpone Summary Judgment Filing Deadline Until After a Decision on a Pending Discovery Motion. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation allowing certain additional depositions to occur after the discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation Allowing Certain Depositions to Occur After the Close of Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulation to extend time to file discovery plan and scheduling order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis
Represented By: Richard Segerblom
Represented By: Thatcher A Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?