McKenna v. David Z. Chesnoff, Chtd. P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle McKenna
Defendant: David Z. Chesnoff, David Z. Chesnoff, Chtd. P.C. and Richard A Schonfeld
Case Number: 2:2014cv01773
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting 212 Stipulation to Extend Time. Settlement documents are due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 191 McKenna's motion for leave to supplement is GRANTED. McKenna must file the supplement to her motion in limine by 11/8/19. Defendants must file any response to that supplement by 11/13/19. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting 143 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/21/2018. The parties are advised that absent extraordinary circumstances, the court will not grant additional extensions in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting 133 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 128 Motion to Compel. Replies due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 108 the Chesnoff defendants' Motion for Reconsideration by District Court of Magistrate Judge C.W. Hoffman's 2/23/17, Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 100 Defendant David Z. Chesnoff, Chtd, P.C. d/b/aChesnoff & Schonfeld's Emergency Motion to Exclude Ruth Cohen and Paul Padda FromDepositions and Limited Disqualification is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [10 4] Defendant's Emergency Motion for a Protective OrderExcluding Ruth Cohen and Paul Padda From Each Others' Depositions and to Prevent Them FromReading Each Others' Transcripts is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court having received 98 the notice of withdrawal of motion to quash filed by non-parties Paul S. Padda, Esq. and Ruth L. Cohen, Esq., it is hereby ordered that 96 Defendant's motion to strike is denied as moo t. Further, based upon the representations of counsel for non-parties Paul S. Padda, Esq. and Ruth L. Cohen, Esq., 95 the motion to quash is also denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 86 defendants' motion to Seal Exhibits re 31 Motion Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendants must file the redacted versions of these exhibits by 12/17/16. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's 62 Response to 53 Motion to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Plaintiff Michelle McKenna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule re 72 Objection to Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. McKenna has satisfied her obligations under 70 the show-cause order and her obligations under the order are hereby DISCHARGED. McKenna's motion to SEAL exhibits 3, 5, and 10-14 of 76 her response is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall maintain these exhibits under seal. Defendants' 31 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' 30 motion to seal their motion for summary judgment and all exhibits is DENIED without prejudice. Defendants must file a new and proper motion to seal the motion and reply by 9/29/16. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation to Extend Time re 58 MOTION for Leave to File. Replies due by 9/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule re 53 MOTION to compel IME of Plaintiff Michelle McKenna. Responses due by 8/15/2016, Replies due by 8/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 38 Motion for Hearing, 39 Motion for Leave to File, 40 Motion for Leave to File, and 45 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that McKenna has until 4/22/16 to respond re 31 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Replies due by 5/9/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendants' 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/24/2015. Replies due by 1/18/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 5/23/2016. Motions due by 6/21/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery (First Request). New Deadlines: Discovery cut-Off: 1/22/2016; Motions to Amend pleadings and add parties: 10/23/2015; Expert designation: 11/23/15; Rebuttal expert designations: 12/30/15; In terim status reports: 11/23/15; Dispositive motions: 2/22/16; and Pretrial Order: 3/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Main Document 24 replaced on 6/17/2015) (PS).
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice 8 , 9 , and 10 Motions for Demand for Security of Costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenna v. David Z. Chesnoff, Chtd. P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Z. Chesnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Z. Chesnoff, Chtd. P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McKenna
Represented By: Sarah A. Harmon
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?