Magdaluyo v. MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Plaintiff: Dante B. Magdaluyo, Jr.
Defendant: MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01806
Filed: October 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDERED that plaintiff Dante Magdaluyo's objections to the clerk's award of MGM's costs (ECF No. 220 ) are SUSTAINED in part. MGM's bill of costs award is reduced to $2,000. Magdaluyo's objections regarding his b ill of costs are OVERRULED. FURTHER ORDERED that 221 Magdaluyo's "Motion for Reclarification" is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 7/16/2018 to correct typographical error (TR).
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER that 193 defendant MGM Grand Hotel, LLC's Objections are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of MGM Grand Hotel, LLC and against plaintiff Dante Magdaluyo, Jr. on the plaintiff's Ti tle VII, defamation, workplace violence, and intentional infliction of emotional distress claims. The plaintiff's invasion of privacy claim has been dismissed with prejudice by stipulation between the parties. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 182 Magdaluyo's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 183 MGM's motion to strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER that 175 the parties' Joint Pretrial Order is REJECTED. The parties shall personally confer as required in Local Rule 16-3, and submit a revised joint pretrial order by June 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER that 160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Veronica Arechederra-Hall is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remove Veronica Arechederra-Hall, Esq. from the CM/ECF service list in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER that 121 MGM's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 127 Magdaluyo's appeal of Magistrate Judge Foley's order on the motion to compel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Cler k shall STRIKE 145 and 147 Magdaluyo's motions to strike evidence and 144 and 146 the accompanying objections. FURTHER ORDERED that 155 MGM's Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER that 135 Emergency Motion to Strike 132 Response to Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall STRIKE 132 plaintiff Dante Magdaluyo's summary judgment response brief. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Dante Magdaluyo shall have until July 29, 2016 to file a response brief that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 103 Motion to Compel Discovery and Denying without prejudice 104 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 101 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 87 and for Sanctions 88 are granted, in part, and denied, in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that 84 Motion to Compel and 85 Motion for Sanctions are denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that 76 Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that 77 Motion Regarding the Sufficiency of Objections and Monetary Sanctions is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that 61 Motion to Extend Discovery is granted. The following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 2/15/2016. Motions due by 3/17/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Withdraw re 53 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing scheduled for 10/13/15 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that 56 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Attorney Amy L Baker is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw From CM/ECF System is GRANTED. The Clerk shall add the last know address of plaintiff to the civil docket and serve plaintiff with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that 2 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff will pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee for a civil action within thirty (30) days of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that if the Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of the action may result. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magdaluyo v. MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Grand Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante B. Magdaluyo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?