Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Defendant: Buena Vista Homeowners Association, Christina Montaruli, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
702) 446-9898 (fax: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv01875
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 110 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 111 SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTE D IN PART and DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 127 SFR's motion to certify a question of law to the Nevada Supreme Court be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 125 Unopposed Motion to add Richard Vilkin to the cm/ecf service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that SFRs Emergency Motion to Stay Briefing and/orLitigation 120 is granted, in part, and denied, in part. Please see Oder for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Remove Attorney Donna M. Wittig from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 09/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Dismiss and Substitute. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC's complaint (ECF No. 1) be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Bank of America, N. A. be substituted in place of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC as the real party in interest with respect to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's counterclaim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Replies due by 2/25/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 446-9898 (fax: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D. Petiprin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Montaruli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?