Sanders v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Debaron Sanders
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian Williams, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01966
Filed: November 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of the Court shall substitute Jerry Howell for Brian Williams, Sr., on the docket for this case, as the respondent warden. FURTHER ORDERED that the Amended Petition for Wr it of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 56 ) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/7/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that 62 Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Respondents will have until September 13, 2018, to file an answer, responding to the remaining claims in petitioner's amended habeas petition, which are Claims 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered September 13, 2017 (ECF No. 51 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 57 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Claims 6, 7, 8, 9, 10 and 11 of petitioner's amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 56 ) are DISMISSED. In all other respects, th e motion to dismiss is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, file an answer, responding to the remaining claims in petitioners third amended habeas petition, which are Claims 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered September 13, 2017 (ECF No. 51 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that 53 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have until March 12, 2018, to file an amended habeas petition. FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered September 13, 2017 (ECF No. 51 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that Mary Lou Wilson is appointed to represent the petitioner, Debaron Sanders, in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall serve copies of this order on Mary Lou Wilson, and the petitioner, Debaron Sanders, as well a s on the respondents. FURTHER ORDERED that Mary Lou Wilson shall have 10 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance for the petitioner, or to indicate to the court her inability to represent the petitioner in these proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that the schedule enumerated in this order shall govern the further litigation of this action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Mario D Valencia is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered on June 20, 2017 (ECF No. 47 ) is vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall serve copies of this order on Mario D. Valencia and the petitioner, Debaron Sanders, as well as on the respondents. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that William H Gamage is discharged as counsel for the petitioner in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that 45 petitioner's Motion for Stay and Abeyance is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Mario Valencia is appointed to represe nt the petitioner, Debaron Sanders, in this action. The clerk of the court shall serve copies of this order on Mario Valencia, William H. Gamage, and the petitioner, Debaron Sanders. Mario Valencia shall have 10 days from the date of entry of this or der to file a notice of appearance for the petitioner, or to indicate to the court his inability to represent the petitioner in these proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that the schedule enumerated in this order shall govern the further litigation of this action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc D. Sanders - MMM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that the court will extend, to June 7, 2017, the time for petitioner to file a first amended habeas petition. This will be the final extension of this deadline for Gamage. The court will hold a further status conference regarding this case on June 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for petitioner shall appear in person in court for that conference. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the court will hold a status conference regarding this case on May 8, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that 38 Motion to Extend Time is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the court will hold a status conference regarding this case on March 22, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for all parties shall appear for that conference. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that petitioner will have until and including February 24, 2017, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered July 14, 2016 (ECF No. 31 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have until and including 1/10/17, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in 31 the order entered 7/14/16 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that William H. Gamage is appointed to represent the petitioner, Debaron Sanders, in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on William Gamage. The clerk of the court shall also serve a copy of this order on the petitioner, Debaron Sanders. FURTHER ORDERED that William Gamage shall have 10 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance for the petitioner, or to indicate to the court his inability to represent the petitioner in these proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that the schedule enumerated in this order shall govern the further litigation of this action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gia McGillivray is discharged from her representation of the petitioner in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for petitioner to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus is su spended. The court will reset that deadline after new counsel is appointed for petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall mail a copy of this order to petitioner, Debaron Sanders. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall have until and including July 11, 2016, to file and serve a first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. FURTHER ORDERED that 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that Petitioner shall within 45 days after the entry of this Order file and serve a First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus or a Notice stating that he will not file an Amended Habeas Petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that Gia A. McGillivray is appointed to represent petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall serve on Gia A. McGillivray a copy of this order together with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus in this case (ECF N o. 6 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Gia A. McGillivray shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance, or to indicate to the court her inability to represent the petitioner in these proceedings. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that 20 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada (FPD) is appointed to represent petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall electronically serve on the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 6 ). The FPD shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance, or to indicate to the court its inability to represent t he petitioner in these proceedings.FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Petitioner's response to the motion to dismiss is suspended, pending the appointment of counsel to represent him. After counsel has appeared for petitioner, the court will set a new deadline for petitioner to respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that 11 Motion for Enlargement of Time Nunc Pro Tunc is GRANTED. Respondents shall have until and including December 17, 2015, to answer or otherwise respond to 6 the habeas corpus petition. If respondents file an answer, petitione r shall then have 45 days to file a reply. If respondents file a motion to dismiss, petitioner shall then have 45 days to file a response to the motion to dismiss, and then respondents shall have 20 days to file a reply in support of that motion. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that 8 Motion to Combine Habeas Cases is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from the date of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The clerk shall file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. The clerk of the court shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney Genera l for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents and electronically serve respondents with the petition and this order. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall appear in this action within 30 days from the entry of this order, but need not respon d to the habeas corpus petition in this action unless and until ordered by the court to do so. FURTHER ORDERED that 2 "Motion for Help to Do My Case" is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Debaron Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?