McCabe v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Suzy McCabe
Defendant: Wal-Mart Neighborhood Market and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01987
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Spoliation of Evidence. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on this motion set for 03/03/2016, at 9:00 a.m., is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Amended Joint Pretrial Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2016 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Calendar Call set for 8/1/2016 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Motions due by 7/1/2016. Trial Briefs, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Voir Dire due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Defendant's 40 Motion to Compel Deposition of Non-Party William Reeves, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation and Order to Amend Caption. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the record's caption to reflect plaintiff's name as "Susie McCabe." Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/06/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation for FRCP 34 Site Inspection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Responses to 28 Motion to Compel and 30 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines due by 8/13/2015. It Is Further Ordered that Replies to 28 Motion to Compel and 30 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines due by 8/14/2015. It Is Further O rdered that the Court will hear argument regarding these motions at the motions hearing currently set for August 18, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/2/2015. Motions due by 10/5/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCabe v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzy McCabe
Represented By: Ryan M. Anderson
Represented By: Kimball Joseph Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Neighborhood Market
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?